Accounts and annual returns MID-SUSSEX ZIPPER CLUB

Charity number: 802831
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2011 26 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2011 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2010 07 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2010 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2009 04 May 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2009 Not Required