Financial history THE ORWELL FAMILY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 802922
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £2.49k £1.64k £2.51k £3.60k £7.36k
Total expenditure £1.35k £1.15k £2.22k £1.80k £2.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A