Accounts and annual returns GAINSBOROUGH LODGE NO 9332 MASONIC CHARITIES ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 803223
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 17 June 2010 137 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 24 June 2009 144 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2007 23 June 2008 138 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2007 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2006 Not submitted