Financial history THE RAVEN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 803380
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £92.65k £117.83k £138.08k £139.09k £144.74k
Total expenditure £134.75k £160.32k £115.37k £136.91k £71.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A