Financial history CAROUSEL SCHOOL OF GYMNASTICS

Charity number: 803483
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £199.59k £234.23k £247.92k £392.59k £462.85k
Total expenditure £185.07k £169.66k £192.50k £303.57k £408.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £125.13k £25.92k N/A N/A