Accounts and annual returns THE KINGFISHER TRUST

Charity number: 803534
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 21 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 21 February 2025 297 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 21 February 2025 663 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 21 February 2025 1028 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 19 May 2021 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required