Financial history THE CHRISTIAN ORDER TRUST

Charity number: 803774
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2009 31/05/2010 31/05/2011 31/05/2012 31/05/2013
Total gross income £3.48k £1.12k £21 £5.01k £9.14k
Total expenditure £630 £1 £6.50k £12.20k £77.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A