Financial history KENT THAMES-SIDE GROUNDWORK TRUST

Charity number: 803803
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £1.08m £1.29m £1.16m £605.45k £0
Total expenditure £1.04m £1.27m £1.14m £674.39k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £59.00k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £60.74k N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £478.83k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £5.16k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £1.72k N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £653.83k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £7.48k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A