Charity overview THOMAS HEATH
Charity number: 214149-6
Linked charity
Governing document
FOUNDATION BEFORE 1786, SCHEME OF 15 AUGUST 1913, REP. VOL. 13 P.407
Charitable objects
THE BENEFIT OF POOR PERSONS OF THE PARISH.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF CHEADLE
Registration history
- 21 March 1968: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 21 September 2009: Standard registration
- 09 September 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
- 17 September 2015: Re-registered
- 09 September 2016: Removed (Does not operate)
- 23 September 2016: Re-registered
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.