Accounts and annual returns RESTORMEL MENTALLY HANDICAPPED LIMITED

Charity Number: 900274
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2007 10 December 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 02 November 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 08 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2004 12 July 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 Not Required