Financial history TETSWORTH VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 900419
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £21.63k £31.99k £57.00k £18.62k £16.00k
Total expenditure £12.34k £22.14k £12.98k £37.27k £23.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £21.91k £38.96k N/A N/A