Accounts and annual returns IFOLD AND DISTRICT LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity Number: 900575
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2014 07 October 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2014 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2013 15 July 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2013 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2012 09 December 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2012 Not Required