Financial history CYMDEITHAS CANOLFAN CAE CYMRO

Charity Number: 1039492
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £29.46k £36.29k £21.53k £17.15k £22.72k
Total expenditure £28.41k £11.45k £17.44k £20.56k £34.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £23.00k £2.00k N/A N/A