Financial history ST HUGH'S SCHOOL (CARSWELL) TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 309640
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £6.20m £6.37m £6.63m £6.80m £7.41m
Total expenditure £6.12m £6.22m £6.97m £7.05m £7.53m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £52.62k £91.66k £221.53k £240.63k £348.94k
Income - Charitable activities £6.14m £6.06m £6.36m £6.51m £7.01m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £35.22k £130 £94 £49.53k £10.94k
Income - Other £0 £224.54k £47.40k £0 £43.94k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.12m £6.20m £6.94m £7.02m £7.52m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £14.69k £38.46k £24.38k £17.94k
Expenditure - Governance £58.56k £46.69k £0 £80.00k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0