Financial history LE CORNU CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1088294
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £23.99k £18.26k £17.46k £20.29k £21.69k
Total expenditure £54.78k £56.47k £20.05k £76.99k £60.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A