Financial history ICFEM - MISSION (EUROPE)

Charity Number: 1107038
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £334.05k £437.66k £421.80k £413.07k £0
Total expenditure £371.91k £383.66k £317.62k £423.64k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A