Financial history The Professional Teaching Institute

Charity number: 1116224
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £1.21m £1.01m £1.37m £1.17m £1.24m
Total expenditure £1.29m £1.02m £1.52m £1.47m £1.54m
Income from government contracts £49.89k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £24.94k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £720.54k £2.62m £918.78k £759.51k £856.29k
Income - Other trading activities £20.00k £0 £39.60k £16.43k £18.64k
Income - Charitable activities £432.43k £332.08k £407.72k £380.04k £347.83k
Income - Endowments £0 £2.00m £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £37.59k £53.58k £3.88k £16.71k £20.93k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.09m £860.29k £1.34m £1.33m £1.40m
Expenditure - Raising funds £198.29k £162.96k £182.71k £137.78k £139.96k
Expenditure - Governance £23.90k £30.96k £39.10k £40.37k £43.22k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £18.98k £43.75k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0