Financial history SMR PHOENIX

Charity number: 1125405
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £260.23k £270.32k £285.49k £285.93k £253.83k
Total expenditure £291.20k £315.71k £316.41k £285.65k £261.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0