Financial history PLOT IO COMMUNITY PLAY PROJECT

Charity Number: 1025599
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £253.72k £218.47k £176.93k £210.37k £234.33k
Total expenditure £221.38k £222.26k £217.93k £215.73k £235.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £186.60k N/A £110.59k £117.59k £138.94k