Financial history LOWTHER STREET ANNEXE

Charity number: 1039066
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £15.18k £15.40k £16.04k £16.59k £16.65k
Total expenditure £9.12k £7.20k £4.13k £5.05k £3.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A