Financial history THE ARBIB LUCAS CHARITY

Charity number: 208666
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £27.75k £18.66k £23.67k £24.08k £20.34k
Total expenditure £53.04k £35.19k £45.74k £60.61k £72.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A