Financial history LITTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 266232
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £14.57k £9.43k £14.06k £5.07k £30.91k
Total expenditure £5.74k £3.51k £11.14k £4.22k £45.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A £8.77k N/A £7.61k