Financial history ERINASTAR LIMITED

Charity Number: 270957
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £253.81k £187.60k £176.93k £180.38k £181.51k
Total expenditure £865.07k £339.15k £994.06k £727.92k £753.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A