Financial history ABBEYFIELD (EXMOUTH) SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity Number: 271317
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £189.45k £189.52k £155.48k £189.69k £208.46k
Total expenditure £153.36k £151.29k £177.41k £187.59k £202.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A