Trustees The Bristol Collegiate Research Society
Charity number: 313491

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr John Cyril Manley | Chair | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Palminder Kaur Smart | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Paul Monk | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Keith John Syrett | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Margaret Ashton | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel James Parkes | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Forgan Curling | Trustee | 12 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Heath | Trustee | 12 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor RACHAEL GOOBERMAN-HILL | Trustee | 16 May 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.