Financial history THE TUESDAY BURCHETT CLUB HUNGERFORD

Charity Number: 1096047
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £8.93k £4.76k £9.56k £20.19k £13.61k
Total expenditure £10.24k £4.24k £8.68k £5.80k £8.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £13.11k £4.75k