Governance ABBEY VILLAGE AND BRINSCALL PLAYGROUP
Charity number: 1102416
Removed charity
Registration history:
- 01 March 2004: Standard registration
- 02 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 05 March 2013: Re-registered
- 09 February 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
- 27 July 2017: Re-registered
- 28 July 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.