Financial history THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO (UK) FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1109029
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £5.46k £16.33k £11.25k £3.13k £46.63k
Total expenditure £27.55k £16.82k £10.37k £4.08k £43.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A