Financial history WEST OF ENGLAND SPORT TRUST

Charity number: 1114495
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £906.94k £873.80k £2.27m £1.80m £1.36m
Total expenditure £690.95k £863.09k £1.47m £2.11m £1.42m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £674.26k £679.14k £1.30m £1.61m £1.16m
Income - Donations and legacies £833.57k £793.74k £2.14m £1.63m £1.16m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £70.36k £78.78k £129.38k £147.82k £144.02k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.01k £1.28k £1.23k £17.85k £54.84k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £690.95k £863.09k £1.47m £2.11m £1.42m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £6.22k £49.26k £41.05k £40.41k £56.24k
Expenditure - Grants institution £87.29k £240.19k £699.75k £1.23m £507.32k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0