Financial history KRUNCH UK

Charity number: 1114961
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £454.03k £465.77k £476.99k £523.38k £526.86k
Total expenditure £370.03k £417.16k £482.72k £524.61k £572.74k
Income from government contracts £139.29k £108.16k £111.90k £187.83k £162.33k
Income from government grants £107.80k £148.64k £133.98k £90.39k £76.96k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £236.48k £235.07k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £286.25k £290.44k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £649 £1.35k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £522.55k £568.92k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £1.95k £3.82k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £10.10k £6.07k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £110 £0