Financial history ST JOSEPH'S CONVENT PREPARATORY SCHOOL GRAVESEND

Charity number: 1119139
Charity reporting is overdue by 310 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £924.53k £835.19k £833.91k £1.13m £104.54k
Total expenditure £1.04m £1.02m £1.02m £1.10m £101.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £61.76k £31.25k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £300 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other trading activities £13.84k £11.19k £12.42k £8.21k N/A
Income - Charitable activities £894.19k £810.60k £755.50k £653.69k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £1.99k £2.05k £953 £83 N/A
Income - Other £14.50k £11.05k £65.04k £468.60k N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.04m £1.02m £1.02m £1.09m N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £6.74k £4.56k £4.53k £5.64k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £4.08k £4.20k £4.44k £7.45k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A