Financial history FOOTPRINTS ORPHANAGE

Charity number: 1126967
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £132.47k £129.84k £127.56k £130.32k £172.83k
Total expenditure £136.49k £109.79k £96.81k £114.37k £219.86k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A