Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARK'S, LACHE-CUM-SALTNEY
Charity number: 1130731

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev HENRIETTA JOHNSTON | Chair | 26 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
Rev Kathryn Jane Helen Elsmore | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edward Paul Sperring | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Andrew Jones | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Suzette Jane Crisp | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jack Alex Jackson | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Griffiths | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Elizabeth Harris | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Chesters | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christine Mackay | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Pitt | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Judy Evans | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Simon Chesters | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.