Financial history DRUGSCIENCE LTD

Charity number: 1150449
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £672.18k £621.63k £998.77k £915.58k £704.90k
Total expenditure £453.71k £552.33k £691.97k £706.74k £568.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £665.58k £600.19k £989.08k £516.11k £401.62k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £6.60k £21.44k £9.69k £399.47k £303.28k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £347.01k £449.42k £556.37k £585.39k £414.85k
Expenditure - Raising funds £106.70k £102.91k £135.60k £121.34k £153.43k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £12.12k £10.74k £14.57k £30.89k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0