Financial history ONE TRUST

Charity number: 1164523
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.48m £3.43m £2.90m £3.71m £3.80m
Total expenditure £3.27m £3.64m £3.10m £3.80m £3.84m
Income from government contracts £3.47m £2.71m £2.80m £3.70m £3.73m
Income from government grants N/A £717.48k £95.64k N/A £66.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £10.93k £0 £338 £1.34k £2.07k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.47m £2.71m £2.80m £3.70m £3.79m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.27k £165 £174 £184 £302
Income - Other £2.58k £717.48k £97.69k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.26m £3.64m £3.10m £3.80m £3.84m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £75.30k £194.14k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £11.41k £548 £544 £592 £586