Trustees VILLAGE HALL, DALTON
Charity number: 516589

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICK FLETCHER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Victoria Clark | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Hudson | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Cellier | Trustee | 24 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dale Cellier | Trustee | 24 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Bumby | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
michaela kitching | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emma Binks | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Williams | Trustee | 11 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Atkinson | Trustee | 25 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA RAMSHAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR LES BINKS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SYLVIA BINKS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR JOHN RAMSHAY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.