WWL RADIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a radio service for hospitals, residential homes and similar institutions, and for patients receiving community care to aid the relief of sickness, poor health and old age amongst people living in Wigan and its surrounding areas; and to advance the promotion of the benefits of living a healthy lifestyle for public benefit. This is done from our studio at Wrightington Hospital
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Wigan
Governance
- 03 February 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diane Louise Herring | Chair | 13 July 2021 |
|
|||||
John Fenton | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN MORRIS | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Alan Boardman | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER RISLEY | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|||||
KEVIN RILEY | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £600 | £1.21k | £2.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.05k | £1.79k | £1.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 03 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS, POOR HEALTH AND OLD AGE AMONGST PEOPLE LIVING IN WIGAN AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS BY PROVIDING A LOCAL BROADCASTING SERVICE FOR HOSPITALS, RESIDENTIAL HOMES AND SIMILAR INSTITUTIONS, AND FOR PATIENTS RECEIVING COMMUNITY CARE; 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF SICKNESS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF THE BENEFITS OF LIVING A HEALTHY LIFESTYLE, AND THE IMPORTANCE OF MAINTAINING GOOD PERSONAL MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH BY (MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) THE MEANS OF BROADCASTING HEALTH EDUCATION MESSAGES TO PEOPLE LIVING IN WIGAN AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WRIGHTINGTON HOSPITAL NHS TRUST
HALL LANE
WRIGHTINGTON
WIGAN
WN6 9EP
- Phone:
- 01257256361
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window