Financial history GUIDES CYMRU

Charity Number: 521209
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £942.87k £514.84k £397.55k £413.93k £527.58k
Total expenditure £851.49k £350.61k £283.94k £427.78k £499.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £73.78k £41.00k £51.00k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £12.38k £10.71k N/A N/A £10.77k
Income - Other trading activities £312.04k £8.62k N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £607.29k £416.28k N/A N/A £507.79k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £11.16k £8.30k N/A N/A £9.02k
Income - Other £0 £70.94k N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 £5.00k N/A N/A £10.14k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £742.67k £345.99k N/A N/A £495.65k
Expenditure - Raising funds £108.82k £4.62k N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance £29.49k £16.48k N/A N/A £21.68k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A £3.56k