Financial history PRIEST WESTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 522562
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.00k £19.97k £9.62k £1.53k £4.80k
Total expenditure £3.00k £4.44k £18.04k £2.79k £4.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.15k £19.93k N/A N/A N/A