Dogfen lywodraethu COTSWOLD ARCHAEOLOGY LTD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/03/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/12/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/09/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/11/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/02/2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 02/08/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/12/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13/01/2012 as amended on 23 Nov 2021 as amended on 20 Dec 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF ARCHAEOLOGY AND THE APPRECIATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE CULTURAL HERITAGE AND HISTORIC ENVIRONMENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Maes buddion
UNITED KINGDOM AND OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.