Trustees THE ROYAL GURKHA RIFLES TRUST
Charity number: 1036834
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lieutenant Colonel Nicholas Lowrey Moran | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colonel David John Robinson | Trustee | 12 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Lt Col Hugo Stanford-Tuck Lt Col | Trustee | 06 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
BRIGADIER STRICKLAND | Trustee | 06 January 2016 |
|
|||||
LT COL D M REX | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
HENRY GUY WARREN STANFORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
James Anthony William Coulson | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.