Trustees THE FRIENDS OF NASSINGTON SCHOOL

Charity number: 1036954
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kate Cook Chair 01 September 2022
None on record
Charlotte Majendie Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
Jessica Churchman Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
Emily Jennings Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
Michelle Rose Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Caroline Thorley Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Thomas James Atkins Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Natasha Robinson Trustee 27 September 2021
None on record
Alexa Campbell Trustee 27 September 2021
None on record
Anna Stockley Trustee 27 September 2021
None on record
Hannah Mason Trustee 14 September 2018
None on record
Laura Jayne Roberts Trustee 01 October 2016
None on record
Joy Louise Forster Trustee 01 October 2016
None on record