BLACK ENVIRONMENT NETWORK

Charity number: 1048390
Charity reporting is 726 days late
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 Not yet received
361 days overdue
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not yet received
361 days overdue
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not yet received
726 days overdue
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not yet received
726 days overdue
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 April 2018 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 April 2018 454 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 22 September 2016 235 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 18 January 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)