Dogfen lywodraethu WORCESTER CONSOLIDATED MUNICIPAL CHARITY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME DATED 30/12/1977 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 18/05/1988 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 29/08/2002 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 30/10/2002 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 24/02/2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 29/02/2012 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 28/05/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) PROVISION OF ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR PERSONS WHO HAVE RESIDED IN THE CITY OF WORCESTER FOR NOT LESS THAN 5 YEARS. 2) PROVISION OF PENSIONS FOR POOR PERSONS WHO HAVE RESIDED IN THE CITY OF WORCESTER FOR NOT LESS THAN 5 YEARS. 3) TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE CITY OF WORCESTER WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Maes buddion
CITY OF WORCESTER.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.