Dogfen lywodraethu THE TOGETHER TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION REVISED JULY 1961 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 31/3/1967, 2/12/1983, 28/11/1997, 14/1/2010 AND 10/11/2014 as amended on 08 May 2007 as amended on 29 Nov 2018 as amended on 03 Jan 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS, WHICH WILL BE CARRIED OUT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ARE: (A) TO GIVE AID, ASSISTANCE AND CARE TO THOSE WITH DISABILITIES OR IN NEED, INCLUDING TO CHILDREN AND/OR YOUNG PERSONS; AND (B) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION, TRAINING AND ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE OF THOSE WITH DISABILITIES OR IN NEED. INCLUDING THAT OF CHILDREN AND/OR YOUNG PERSONS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.