Dogfen lywodraethu C J GALLARD'S ALMSHOUSES
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME DATED 15/04/1969 AS AMENDED BY ORDER OF 29/3/2006, SCHEME DATED 6/02/2007 AND RESOLUTIONS DATED 16/07/2007, 12/5/2008 & 22/10/2013 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 11/05/2015 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 11 JUL 2016 as amended on 10 May 2018 as amended on 14 Nov 2019 as amended on 12 May 2022 as amended on 12 Jan 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR MARRIED COUPLES, SINGLE MEN AND SINGLE WOMEN OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO ARE NOT LESS THAN 55 YEARS OF AGE AND WHO HAVE RESIDED IN THE BOROUGH OF TUNBRIDGE WELLS IN KENT WITH PRIORITY GIVEN TO APPLICANTS FROM SOUTHBOROUGH.
Maes buddion
BOROUGH OF TUNBRIDGE WELLS, KENT
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.