ROCHFORD CHARITIES

Charity number: 210524
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £20.42k £21.27k £72.77k £77.17k £41.08k
Total expenditure £22.54k £22.73k £29.17k £11.14k £18.41k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £51.00k £1.18k N/A