Trustees THE ROYAL SHAKESPEARE COMPANY, STRATFORD-UPON-AVON
Charity number: 212481
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shriti Vinodkant Vadera | Chair | 29 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tamara Catherine Harvey | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Robert Hytner | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Daniel Gwyn Evans | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Ayanna Thompson | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Winsome May Pinnock FRSL | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Miller MBE | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Amanda Joycelyn Parker | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Justine Anquetil Themen | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Kate Williams | Trustee | 20 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Liz Vernon | Trustee | 20 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Clare Reddington | Trustee | 28 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARK THOMPSON | Trustee | 17 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARK LYNDON SMITH | Trustee | 17 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ian Squires | Trustee | 14 November 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.