Dogfen lywodraethu TOWN AND COUNTRY PLANNING ASSOCIATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3RD MARCH 1917 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS OF 13TH APRIL 1965, 25TH JANUARY 1989, 18TH APRIL 1989, 25TH APRIL 1995 AND 24TH APRIL 1997 AS AMENDED 13 JULY 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09 JAN 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE AND IMPROVE THE ART AND SCIENCE OF TOWN AND COUNTRY PLANNING, AND TO PROMOTE ENCOURAGE AND ASSIST THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS OF EVERY DESCRIPTION IN THE SAID ART AND SCIENCE AND IN ALL OTHER ARTS AND SCIENCES CONNECTED THEREWITH.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.