Dogfen lywodraethu THE BEACON LODGE CHARITABLE TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 AUGUST 1965, AS AMENDED 25 OCTOBER 1979, 15 JULY 198, 4 FEBRUARY 1991 AND 12 JANUARY 2006 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 14 JUL 2016 as amended on 07 Mar 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE WELFARE AND SUPPORT OF CHILDREN AND THEIR PARENTS BY:- (1) SUPPORTING AND ASSISTING THOSE IN NEED, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS AND PREGNANT WOMEN BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL RELIEF IN THE FORM OF GRANTS OR LOANS AND BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND INFORMATION; (2) PROMOTING THEIR HEALTH; AND (3) ADVANCING THEIR EDUCATION.
Maes buddion
THE FORMER HORNSEY DEANERY AND ELSEWHERE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.